Board | Home | Sutton Coldfield | Olton | Away | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1 (W) | 1908 (1879) | N Escott, Keith L | ½ - ½ | B Reynolds, Robert | 1778 (1805) |
2 (B) | 1855 (1827) | G Soszynski, Marek J | 1 - 0 | B Liszewski, Richard | 1749 (1873) |
3 (W) | 1763 (1902) | G Pyda, Arjun | 0 - 1 | B Cottom, Andrew | 1746 (1709) |
4 (B) | 1744 (1771) | N Brown, Noel A | 1 - 0 | B Threlfall, Roger | 1718 (1684) |
5 (W) | 1736 (1684) | G Dhesi, Iqbal S | ½ - ½ | N Grzywaczewski, Karol | 1666 (1678) |
6 (B) | 1693 (1749) | N Czopek, Wojciech | 1 - 0 | B Evans, Thomas | 1631 (1632) |
Total | 10699 | 4 - 2 | Total | 10288 |
Last update Marek Soszynski Mon 21st Mar 2022 23:22. Reported by Marek Soszynski Mon 21st Mar 2022 23:22. Verified By
Comments
rreynolds
Mon, 07/03/2022 - 23:04
Permalink
Press / Admin Comment
adjournments 21/3
msoszynski
Wed, 09/03/2022 - 21:13
Permalink
Olton Bd2 resigned by phone
Olton Bd2 resigned by phone 9th March.
msoszynski
Mon, 21/03/2022 - 23:24
Permalink
Olton Bd4 resigned by email
Olton Bd4 resigned by email 21st March.